WV SB733 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing political party status

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing political party status

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 146) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-17HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-17HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-14SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 146)
2020-02-14SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-14SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-13SenateAmendment not germane
2020-02-13SenateFloor amendment reported
2020-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-13SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-12SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-12SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-11SenateReported do pass
2020-02-07SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-07SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
318Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback