WV SB732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing fee payment and expense reimbursement for attorneys who participate on court teams established by Supreme Court of Appeals
Title
Authorizing fee payment and expense reimbursement for attorneys who participate on court teams established by Supreme Court of Appeals
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-29 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-29 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 21 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |