WV SB729 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to awards and disability under Deputy Sheriff Retirement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to awards and disability under Deputy Sheriff Retirement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 579) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 278) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 277) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/18/20
2020-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 579)
2020-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseDo pass
2020-02-26HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-26HouseTo Finance
2020-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 278)
2020-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-25SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 277)
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-21SenateReported do pass
2020-02-13SenateTo Finance
2020-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-02-07SenateTo Pensions
2020-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-07SenateTo Pensions then Finance
2020-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4111 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - To House Pensions and Retirement

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
714D14Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback