WV SB728 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring registered sex offenders pay annual fee
Title
Requiring registered sex offenders pay annual fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 305) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 305) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |