WV SB717 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation from General Revenue to WV Community and Technical College Education, Control Account
Title
Supplemental appropriation from General Revenue to WV Community and Technical College Education, Control Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 529) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 528) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 278) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 278) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 528) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 278) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 278) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/13/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/21 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 529) |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 528) |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Do pass |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Finance |
2021-04-01 | House | To Finance |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 278) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 278) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |