WV SB711 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add to the list of federal agencies and agents who under limited circumstances may enforce state laws.
Title
Clarifying that qualified law enforcement from any federal agency may enforce state laws under limited circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 196) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 196) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 196) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 196) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 196) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |