WV SB704 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 285)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 285)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dispatching of towing service for emergency towing of vehicles
Title
Dispatching of towing service for emergency towing of vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 285) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 285) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 6 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |