WV SB7 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Limiting political activity by public employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting political activity by public employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 37) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2021-04-09HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-04-09HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-08HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-07HouseRead 1st time
2021-04-07HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-06HouseWith amendment, do pass
2021-02-26HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-02-26HouseTo Judiciary
2021-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 37)
2021-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-02-24SenateRomano/Trump Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-02-24SenateFloor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-02-23SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/23/21, amend pending
2021-02-23SenateFloor amendment reported
2021-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2021-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2021-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2021-02-19SenateCommittee substitute reported
2021-02-10SenateTo Judiciary
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-10SenateTo Judiciary
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6B41New CodeSee Bill Text
6B42New CodeSee Bill Text
6B43New CodeSee Bill Text
6B44New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=7&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB7%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=7
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB7%20SUB1.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=7
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB7%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=7
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB7%20SFA%20TRUMP%202-19%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB7%20SFA%20_1%20ROMANO%20AND%20TRUMP%202-24.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB7%20SFAT%20_1%20TRUMP%202-24.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB7%20SFA%20_1%20ROMANO%20AND%20TRUMP%202-24%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB7%20HJUD%20AM%204-5.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB7%20HJUD%20AMT%20_1%204-5.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/02-25-0037.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback