WV SB690 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to overland recreation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting street-legal special purpose vehicles on highways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 614) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 662) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 307) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/18/20
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 614)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 662)
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-04HouseFrom Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseFrom Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-02-27HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-02-27HouseTo Government Organization
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 307)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-25SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateImmediate consideration
2020-02-24Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-02-04SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-04SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2020-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17A131New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=690&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB690%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=690
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB690%20SUB1.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=690
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB690%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=690
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB690%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=690
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-26-0307.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00662.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0614.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback