WV SB69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating "Choose Life" special registration plate supporting adoption
Title
Creating "Choose Life" special registration plate supporting adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-02-23 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |