WV SB687 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing compensation of elected county officials
Title
Increasing compensation of elected county officials
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Paul Hardesty [D] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 306) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 306) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |