WV SB686 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting facilities governed by DHHR that provide direct patient care
Title
Exempting facilities governed by DHHR that provide direct patient care
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Kenny Mann [R] |
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 480) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 491) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 491) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 480) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 491) |
2017-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-29 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |