WV SB685 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Deferred until foot of Misc. Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Deferred until foot of Misc. Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to WV Real Estate Licnese Act
Title
Relating to WV Real Estate License Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Owens Brown [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. David Stover [R] |
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 643) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Deferred until foot of Misc. Business |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 643) |
2022-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment pending |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-24 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 40 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 27 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |