WV SB685 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a one-day special license for charitable events sell nonintoxicating beer
Title
Creating a one-day special license for charitable events sell nonintoxicating beer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 229) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 229) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |