WV SB680 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Adding Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation employees to Survivor Benefits Act
Title
Adding Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation employees to Survivor Benefits Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 300) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | To Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 300) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5H | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5H | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |