WV SB679 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Office of Inspector General to promulgate rules concerning the location of forensic group homes.
Title
Requiring Office of Inspector General to promulgate rules concerning location of forensic group homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 395) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 395) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 298) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 298) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 395) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 298) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 298) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 258, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 395) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 395) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) |
2023-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 452) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 298) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 298) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |