WV SB677 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 281, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 281, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill relates to the West Virginia Disaster Recovery Trust Fund and clarifies the roles and responsibilities of the State Resiliency Officer. The bill requires the State Resiliency Officer to submit a new Flood Resiliency Plan by a date certain and then biannually thereafter; directs the State Resiliency Officer to hire additional staff; removes the West Virginia Disaster Recovery Trust Fund from the jurisdiction of the Division of Homeland Security and Emergency Management; provides initial capital for the State Resiliency Office; allows for disbursement of post-disaster recovery assistance; requires that 50 percent of disbursements be expended to benefit low-income communities; requires resilience and mitigation certifications prior to disbursement to political subdivisions; requires the State Resiliency Officer to develop an annual expenditure report; establishes the West Virginia Resiliency Trust Fund within the State Resiliency and Flood Protection Act; requires 50 percent of disbursements be expended to implement nature-based solutions; allows for grants to political subdivisions for both Flood Resiliency Plan implementation and local flood prevention and protection studies; and requires 25 percent of Community Development Block Grant Disaster Recovery Funds received by the state as a result of a flood disaster to be deposited in the Flood Resiliency Trust Fund.
Title
Clarifying role and responsibilities of State Resiliency Officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 598) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 598) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 706) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 700) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 699) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 297) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 598) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 706) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 700) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 699) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 297) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 281, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/17/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 598) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 598) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 706) |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | House reconsidered date effective |
2023-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 700) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 699) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 297) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 26 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 4b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 4c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 2A | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 31 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |