WV SB676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to establish a dedicated fund for the acquisition, construction, maintenance, and rehabilitation of roads suitable for off-road vehicle recreation. The bill also establishes a grant program with administrative provisions to review, approve, and manage applications for grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to off-road vehicle recreation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 551) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 550) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 551)
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 550)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-28HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 288)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 288)
2019-02-27SenateUnanimous consent to commit bill to Rules objected to
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateSenator Beach requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateMotion to read a first time adopted
2019-02-25SenateReported do pass
2019-02-25SenateOriginating in Senate Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172A11Amended CodeCitation Text
20112aNew CodeSee Bill Text
20118dNew CodeSee Bill Text
20171New CodeSee Bill Text
20172New CodeSee Bill Text
20173New CodeSee Bill Text
20174New CodeSee Bill Text
20175New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback