WV SB675 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require the Department of Environmental Protection to create and implement an Adopt-A-Stream Program, to encourage the removal of litter along Wests Virginia’s rivers and streams by volunteers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring DEP create and implement Adopt-A-Stream Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 493) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 494)
2019-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 493)
2019-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseDo pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 287)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 287)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2019-02-26SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-25SenateReported do pass
2019-02-25SenateOriginating in Senate Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2215A3Amended CodeCitation Text
2215A3aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=675&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb675%20org.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=675
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb675%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=675
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb675%20ENG2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=675
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb675%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=675
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-27-0287.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00493.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00494.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback