WV SB674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting DOH purchase hardware items and equipment from local seller
Title
Permitting DOH purchase hardware items and equipment from local seller
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |