WV SB674 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation for Medical servcices to DHHR

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation to Division of Human Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-28HouseTo Finance
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 286)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 286)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-25SenateReported do pass
2019-02-25SenateOriginating in Senate Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback