WV SB673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public higher education accountability and planning
Title
Relating to public higher education accountability and planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 673) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House receded (Roll No. 672) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 569) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 568) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 285) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House receded (Roll No. 672) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 569) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 568) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 285) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 673) |
2019-03-09 | House | House receded (Roll No. 672) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 569) |
2019-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 568) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed at foot of bills |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-28 | House | To Education |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 285) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Originating in Senate Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1D | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 7 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18C | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |