WV SB672 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing School Building Authority to promulgate legislative rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing School Building Authority to promulgate legislative rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 549) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 548) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 549)
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 548)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Education
2019-02-28HouseTo Education
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 284)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 284)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateSenator Unger requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateReported do pass
2019-02-23SenateOriginating in Senate Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
189D21Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback