WV SB672 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing School Building Authority to promulgate legislative rules
Title
Authorizing School Building Authority to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 549) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 548) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 548) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 549) |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 548) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-28 | House | To Education |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 284) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Unger requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Originating in Senate Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |