WV SB670 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to filling vacancies in elected offices
Title
Relating to filling vacancies in elected offices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment to amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Floor amendment reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |