WV SB666 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to place a cap on the maximum penalty--50 years-- that can be imposed upon conviction for first-degree robbery.
Title
Placing cap on maximum penalty that may be imposed for first-degree robbery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 320) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 320) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |