WV SB665 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring persons convicted of certain crimes on or after March 8, 1995, provide DNA samples
Title
Requiring persons convicted of certain crimes on or after March 8, 1995, provide DNA samples
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 96) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 96) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 96) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 96) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 96) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |