WV SB662 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing restrictions on fiduciary commissioners
Title
Removing restrictions on fiduciary commissioners
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 480) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 516) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 515) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 516) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 515) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 480) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-04 | House | House requests Senate to concur in changed effective date |
2020-03-04 | House | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 516) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 515) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |