WV SB66 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a Voluntary WVU Rifle Team Check-off Program on the cost of hunting and fishing license. The bill creates a special fund for this purpose and designates how funds are to be used.
Title
Creating Voluntary WVU Rifle Team Check-Off Program on hunting and fishing licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] |
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-25 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/19/21 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |