WV SB655 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating sunset and legislative audit provisions for certain PSC rules
Title
Eliminating sunset and legislative audit provisions for certain PSC rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 567) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 567) |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/8 |
2021-04-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-31 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24A | 2 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |