WV SB655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to valuation of natural resources land property
Title
Relating to valuation of natural resources land property
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 182) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 182) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Finance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4460 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - To House Energy
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 1C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 1C | 10a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 3 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 3 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |