WV SB652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing School Building Authority promulgate legislative rules
Title
Authorizing School Building Authority promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 400) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 399) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 400) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 399) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2020-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 400) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 399) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-20 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-20 | House | To Education |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |