WV SB645 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating private schools for students with disabilities
Title
Regulating private schools for students with disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | To House Education |
2022-03-03 | House | To Education |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |