WV SB64 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing county commissions to impose amusement tax
Title
Allowing county commissions to impose amusement tax
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 246) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2022-03-02 | House | To Finance |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 246) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4513 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To House Political Subdivisions