WV SB637 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the public disclosure of an individual's personal information on the internet in certain circumstances; and provide penalty for violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting public disclosure of personal information on internet

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 175) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-02-21HouseFiled for introduction
2024-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2024-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 175)
2024-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2024-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2024-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2024-02-16SenateRead 1st time
2024-02-16SenateOn 1st reading
2024-02-15SenateCommittee substitute reported
2024-02-05SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-05SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5A825Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback