WV SB636 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing legislative rules for Higher Education Policy Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing legislative rules for Higher Education Policy Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 431) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 430) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 179) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 179) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-04HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-04HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 431)
2019-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 430)
2019-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-01HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseDo pass
2019-02-20HouseTo House Education
2019-02-20HouseTo Education
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-20SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 179)
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 179)
2019-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-18SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-15SenateReported do pass
2019-02-15SenateOriginating in Senate Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B172Amended CodeCitation Text
18B173Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback