WV SB633 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill relates to the failure to appear. It requires prompt appearances for persons detained on capiases; provides procedures for issuing bench warrants for nonappearance at scheduled court hearings; allows a grace period after a failure to appear to allow a defendant to appear; provides procedures following execution of bench warrants for nonappearance; and requires courts to ensure that inactive capiases are removed from law enforcement databases.
Title
Requiring prompt appearances for persons detained on capiases
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 594) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 693) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 693) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/17/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 594) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 693) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1C | 17B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 2 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |