WV SB633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Board of Physical Therapy conduct criminal background checks on applicants for licenses
Title
Authorizing Board of Physical Therapy conduct criminal background checks on applicants for licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 420) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 543) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 543) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 420) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 543) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |