WV SB632 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring Office of Emergency Medical Services from DHHR to Department of Homeland Security
Title
Making Office of Emergency Medical Services independent office within Executive Branch
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 293) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 293) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 293) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-08 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 293) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 293) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4C | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |