WV SB632 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring video cameras in certain public education classrooms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving student safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 723) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 722) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 485) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 485) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 629) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 628) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - 2nd reference dispensed (Roll No. 438) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - 2nd reference not dispensed (Roll No. 436) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 278) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 278) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 723)
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 722)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 485)
2019-03-09SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 485)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 629)
2019-03-08HouseMotion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 628)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05House2nd reference dispensed (Roll No. 438)
2019-03-05HouseHouse reconsidered its action
2019-03-05HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-05House2nd reference not dispensed (Roll No. 436)
2019-03-05HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-28HouseTo House Education
2019-02-28HouseTo Education then Finance
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 278)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 278)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-02-15SenateTo Education
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-15SenateTo Education then Finance
2019-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182011New CodeSee Bill Text
18548New CodeSee Bill Text
18A28Amended CodeCitation Text
18A36Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=632&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB632%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=632
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB632%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=632
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB632%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=632
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB632%20SUB2%20enr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=632
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-27-0278.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00436.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00438.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00628.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00629.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0485.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00722.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00723.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback