WV SB632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing retired judicial officers recalled to service to avoid limit on temporary payments under certain circumstances
Title
Allowing retired judicial officers recalled to service to avoid limit on temporary payments under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 270) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 269) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 269) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2018-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 270) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 269) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB2125 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Pensions and Retirement
HB4137 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - To House Pensions and Retirement
SB367 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - To Pensions
HB4137 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - To House Pensions and Retirement
SB367 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - To Pensions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |