WV SB627 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit local governments to access certain tax records relating to local development projects.
Title
Permitting local governments to access certain economic development project-related tax records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 203) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 203) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 203) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2018-03-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 203) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 203) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 22 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 38 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |