WV SB625 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB625

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creating one-day annual license to permit charitable auction of sealed rare, antique, or vintage liquor bottles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating one-day annual license to permit charitable auction of sealed rare, antique, or vintage liquor bottles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-03-02HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-29HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/29
2020-02-28HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-27HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-27HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-26HouseDo pass
2020-02-07HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-07HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-06SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 78)
2020-02-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-05SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-05SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-04SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-04SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-01-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-27SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB625 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2019

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6078bNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback