WV SB625 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating WV Volunteer Fire and Rescue Act of 2018
Title
Creating WV Volunteer Fire and Rescue Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 514) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 477) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 514) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 477) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 514) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate reconsidered amendment (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 477) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2018-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2018-02-28 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
Same As/Similar To
HB2094 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Education
HB2361 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Banking and Insurance
HB2608 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB2638 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Political Subdivisions
HB2780 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Judiciary
HB2862 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Education
HB2916 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
HB2977 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB4253 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
SB105 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
SB108 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB128 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
SB251 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - To Health and Human Resources
SB42 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB489 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To Government Organization
SB49 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB59 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB89 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
HB2361 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Banking and Insurance
HB2608 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB2638 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Political Subdivisions
HB2780 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Judiciary
HB2862 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Education
HB2916 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
HB2977 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB4253 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
SB105 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
SB108 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB128 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
SB251 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - To Health and Human Resources
SB42 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB489 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To Government Organization
SB49 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB59 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Government Organization
SB89 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4C | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 2A | 8d | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 5f | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 33b | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
5H | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 1 | 3d | Amended Code | Citation Text |