WV SB624 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to administering ACT or SAT tests to 11th grade students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing county boards of education use alternative assessment provided in Every Student Succeeds Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 671) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 670) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 466) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 465) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 671)
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 670)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message,
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 419)
2019-03-08SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 419)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 466)
2019-03-05HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 465)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-25HouseTo House Education
2019-02-25HouseTo Education
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-23SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 209)
2019-02-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 209)
2019-02-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-22SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-20Senate2nd reference dispensed
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-02-15SenateTo Education
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-15SenateTo Education then Finance
2019-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182E5Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=624&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB624%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=624
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB624%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=624
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB624%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=624
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB624%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=624
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-23-0209.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00465.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00466.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0419.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00670.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00671.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback