WV SB618 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Senator Hamilton requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to effect on levy rate when appraisal results in tax increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to effect on levy rate when appraisal results in tax increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 167) (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSenator Hamilton requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-19SenateRejected by Senate (Roll No. 167)
2019-02-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-19SenateSenator Palumbo requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-19SenateSenator Prezioso requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-19SenateSenator Stollings requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-18SenateSenator Facemire requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-18SenateSenator Ihlenfeld requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2019-02-19SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-15SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-14SenateReported do pass
2019-02-14SenateOriginating in Senate Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback