WV SB617 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 63, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to method of payment to Municipal Pensions Security Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to method of payment to Municipal Pensions Security Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 390) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 491) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 166) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 63, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 390)
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 491)
2019-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-27HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-19HouseTo House Pensions and Retirement
2019-02-19HouseTo Pensions and Retirement then Finance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-19SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 166)
2019-02-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-19SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-15SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-14SenateReported do pass
2019-02-14SenateOriginating in Senate Pensions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82219Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback