WV SB616 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB616

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to employment grievance procedure for public employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employment grievance procedure for public employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 301) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-02-27HouseTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 301)
2020-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-24SenateImmediate consideration
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2020-02-06SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-24SenateTo Government Organization
2020-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-24SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2020-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB616 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - To Pensions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6C23Amended CodeCitation Text
6C26Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback