WV SB616 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB616

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 242, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing maximum gross weight for certain wood-bearing trucks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing maximum gross weight for certain wood-bearing trucks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 397) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 388) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 265) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 242, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/18
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-08SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 397)
2018-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 388)
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseWith amendment, do pass
2018-02-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 265)
2018-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-26SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-26SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-23Senate2nd reference dispensed
2018-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-19SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2018-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-19SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2018-02-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB616 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17C1711Amended CodeCitation Text
17C179aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback