WV SB616 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - To House Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing receipt of gifts, donations and contributions by Division of Energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing receipt of gifts, donations and contributions by Division of Energy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26HouseTo House Energy
2014-02-26HouseTo Energy then Finance
2014-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2014-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2014-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 21)
2014-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2014-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2014-02-24SenateRead 2nd time
2014-02-24SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2014-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2014-02-20SenateReported do pass
2014-02-17SenateTo Finance
2014-02-17SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-17SenateTo Finance
2014-02-17SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5B2F2Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback